THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:11:39 AM
Solomon, Robert Scott
CPSO#:
61179
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Maple Telemedicine
355 Adelaide St W
Suite 100
Toronto ON M5V 0A8
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Quebec
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT SCOTT SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2007 |