skip to content

Soliman, Samy

CPSO#: 86996

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Marzouk Guirguis, Samy Soliman (used until: 22 Dec 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General
Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295 Ext. 5130
Fax: (519) 245-4354 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E3Z8
Canada
Phone: 5196681530
Fax: 5196813282
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Samy Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2015
Corporation Name: Samy Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman ( CPSO# 86996 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 337
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
Stratford ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 668-1530


Corporation Name: Samy Soliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Soliman ( CPSO# 86996 )

Business Address:
1215 Staffordshire Pl
London ON  N6H 0B8
Phone Number: 5192050093

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMY SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011