THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:13:06 PM
Soliman, Samy
CPSO#:
86996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Marzouk Guirguis, Samy Soliman (used until: 22 Dec 2009 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex General
Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-5295 Ext. 5130
Fax: (519) 245-4354
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMY SOLIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLIMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |