skip to content

Sole, Joseph Nicholas

CPSO#: 19124

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 07 Oct 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Oct 1999
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1964
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Oct 1999

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Oct 1999
Summary:

 On October 6, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sole(s guilty plea and found him guilty 
 of professional misconduct.  Subsequently, the Committee ordered his certificate of registration 
 be revoked.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 06, 1999