THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:56:47 PM
Sole, Joseph Nicholas
CPSO#:
19124
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
07 Oct 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jun 1964
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1963 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1964 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 07 Oct 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Oct 1999
Summary:
On October 6, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sole(s guilty plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct. Subsequently, the Committee ordered his certificate of registration be revoked.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 06, 1999