skip to content

Snodgrass, Graham Peter

CPSO#: 23984

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G. Peter Snodgrass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 May 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1968 to 01 Jul 1969
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2014