THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:50:43 PM
Snodgrass, Graham Peter
CPSO#:
23984
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G. Peter Snodgrass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 May 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1968 to 01 Jul 1969
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jul 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2014 |