skip to content

Smith, William Gary

CPSO#: 26277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jul 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1996