THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:57:34 AM
Smith, William Gary
CPSO#:
26277
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 1996 |