skip to content

Smith, Frank Astor

CPSO#: 19982

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Frank Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2016