THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 10:42:27 AM
Smith, Frank Astor
CPSO#:
19982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Feb 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Frank Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Mar 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1966 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 16 Apr 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2016 |