skip to content

Small, Elizabeth Ann

CPSO#: 90518

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Boardwalk Drive
Toronto ON M4L6T1
Toronto ON  M4L 6T1
Phone: 416-5248830 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia
Manitoba
Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2014