THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:11:24 PM
Small, Elizabeth Ann
CPSO#:
90518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
31 Glencrest Blvd
East York ON M4B 1L2
Phone: 4165248830
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Manitoba
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN SMALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2014 |