skip to content

Slizheuski, Siarhei

CPSO#: 96136

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 3118 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr.S.Slizheuski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Slizheuski ( CPSO# 96136 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Campus
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective:12 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:29 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Mar 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014 Active
 Dr. Siarhei Slizheuski may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
            and geriatric medicine, only.