THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:04:08 PM
Slizheuski, Siarhei
CPSO#:
96136
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 3118
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:12 Apr 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
|
Active |