skip to content

Slavina, Anna

CPSO#: 87941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Dec 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2009 Active
             Dr. Anna Slavina may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.