THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:35:16 AM
Slavina, Anna
CPSO#:
87941
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: St. Petersburg State Medical Academy, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A4
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Feb 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Dec 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2009 |
|
Active |