skip to content

Slaney, Nathalie Marie Caroline

CPSO#: 88514

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
119 Memorial Ave
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: 705-329-3649
Fax: 705-329-0653 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Spring St
OVFHT
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
Phone: 6132569370
Fax: 6132560949
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Slaney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHALIE MARIE CAROLINE SLANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011