THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:09:41 PM
Slaney, Nathalie Marie Caroline
CPSO#:
88514
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Spring St
Almonte General Hospital
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
Phone: 6132569370
Fax: 6132560949
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Slaney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MARIE CAROLINE SLANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLANEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2011 |