skip to content

Skolnik, Kate

CPSO#: 97341

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 19 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
EL - Respirology

University Of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 12 May 2017 to 02 Jun 2017
EL - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2017