THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:53:08 PM
Skolnik, Kate
CPSO#:
97341
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
02 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Calgary, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 19 Mar 2012 to 08 Apr 2012
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 May 2017 to 02 Jun 2017
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2017 |