skip to content

Sinha, Prabhat Kumar

CPSO#: 87781

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:L.N. Mithila University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellton Regional Hospital
189 Lily Lake Road
Campbellton NB  E3N 3H3
Phone: (506) 789-5000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
New Brunswick
Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRABHAT KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2017