THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:02:07 AM
Sinha, Prabhat Kumar
CPSO#:
87781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: L.N. Mithila University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Campbellton Regional Hospital
189 Lily Lake Road
Campbellton NB E3N 3H3
Phone: (506) 789-5000
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRABHAT KUMAR SINHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2017 |