skip to content

Singh, Parkash Kaur

CPSO#: 97607

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wakari Hospital
369 Taieri Road, Halfway Bush
Dunedin 9010
New Zealand
Phone: 03-474 0999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Zealand
USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:31 Aug 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PARKASH KAUR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017