THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:26:38 AM
Singh, Parkash Kaur
CPSO#:
97607
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: McMaster University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
St. Joseph's Hospital
Psychiatry
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 905-522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand
USA - Minnesota
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARKASH KAUR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2017 |