Sinajon, Pierre Gene Romulo (CPSO#: 97859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
OPG Building
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE GENE ROMULO SINAJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAJON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2019