THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:58:08 PM
Sinajon, Pierre Gene Romulo
CPSO#:
97859
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Division of Genetics
Rm 1A100
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIERRE GENE ROMULO SINAJON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINAJON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 20 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Feb 2019 |