skip to content

Simson, Stanley Eugene

CPSO#: 17049

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 10-Feb-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Phone: 416-781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014


Address: Accuro Health Services Division of Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories Suite 412 1230 Old Innes Road Ottawa ON K1B 3V3 Telephone: 613-738-1242
Date Received: 13 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:05 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2013