THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:08:25 PM
Simson, Stanley Eugene
CPSO#:
17049
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 1959
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
10-Feb-2018
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Docudavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto ON M6B 3Z4
Phone: 416-781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:05 Dec 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1959 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2013 |