skip to content

Siddiqui, Sameerah

CPSO#: 96566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 FOURTH AVENUE
ST. CATHARINES
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46412
Fax: (905) 684-6411 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 11,
277 WELLAND AVENUE
St Catharines ON  L2R 2P7
Canada
Phone: 2894800192 Ext. EXT 4
Fax: 9059385333
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Syed Faraz Masood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Masood ( CPSO# 92663 )
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 96566 )

Business Address:
St. Catherines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Suite 203
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 357-3988

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647


Corporation Name: Dr. Sameerah Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 96566 )

Business Address:
St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
277 Welland Ave
Unit 11
St Catharines ON  L2R 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active
             Dr. Sameerah Siddiqui may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.