THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:12:41 AM
Siddiqui, Sameerah
CPSO#:
96566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 FOURTH AVENUE
ST. CATHARINES
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46412
Fax: (905) 684-6411
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Apr 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |