skip to content

Sial, Zia Ahmed

CPSO#: 85707

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Polish, Urdu

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
25 Woodbine Downs Blvd.
Unit 10
Etobicoke, ON
Toronto ON  M9B 3Z9
Phone: 416 741-2273
Fax: 416 750-1500 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke Urgent Care Centre
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

75 Braydon Blvd
UNITED URGENT CARE
Brampton ON  L6P 2S4
Canada
Phone: 905 794 7649
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZIA AHMED SIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007