THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:31:36 PM
Sial, Zia Ahmed
CPSO#:
85707
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Polish, Urdu
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Braydon Blvd
United Urgent Care
Brampton ON L6P 2S4
Phone: 905 794 7649
Fax: 905 794 7650
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Canada
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZIA AHMED SIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIAL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |