skip to content

Shulman, David Louis

CPSO#: 28246

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone: (905) 886-1212
Fax: (905) 886-0248 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David L. Shulman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shulman ( CPSO# 28246 )

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Wilderman Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone Number: (905) 866-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID LOUIS SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 08 Oct 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987