THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:44:12 AM
Shulman, David Louis
CPSO#:
28246
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wilderman Medical Clinic
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L4J 1W3
Phone: (905) 886-1212
Fax: (905) 886-0248
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID LOUIS SHULMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHULMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 08 Oct 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jul 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1987 |