skip to content

Shmuilovich, Olga

CPSO#: 89795

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Joseph Health Care
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 105
450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Shmuilovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shmuilovich ( CPSO# 89795 )

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4C2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:24 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Western University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018 Active
             Dr. Olga Shmuilovich may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.