THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:39:11 PM
Shmuilovich, Olga
CPSO#:
89795
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Joseph Health Care
268 Grosvenor St.
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6035
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2018 |
|
Active |