skip to content

Shiffman, David Philip

CPSO#: 17660

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Nov 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Apr 1962

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University Of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1959
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Mar 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Nov 2000