THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:55:52 AM
Shiffman, David Philip
CPSO#:
17660
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Nov 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Apr 1962
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1959 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 1960 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1960 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Mar 1962 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1962 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2000 |