skip to content

Sharma, Sanjeev Parkash

CPSO#: 88277

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Sharma, Sanjeev (used until: 30 Mar 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 728-9872
Fax: (613) 728-8465 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sanjeev Parkash Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharma ( CPSO# 88277 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 728-9872

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANJEEV PARKASH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2020

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)