THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:07:44 AM
Sharma, Sanjeev Parkash
CPSO#:
88277
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sharma, Sanjeev (used until: 30 Mar 2009 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
D-1371 Woodroffe Ave
Ottawa Orthopaedic Centre
Nepean ON K2G 1V7
Phone: 613-728-9872
Fax: 613-728-8465
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANJEEV PARKASH SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 17, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)