skip to content

Sharma, Pratibhasri Adipudi

CPSO#: 89580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Nov 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Nov 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Women's College Hosp
Fertility Centre & CREATE IVF Prgrm
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727 Ext. 2339
Fax: (416) 323-7334 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pratibhasri Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sharma ( CPSO# 89580 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's Hospital
Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 323-7727


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:25 Nov 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active
             Dr.   Pratibhasri   Adipudi  Sharma  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            obstetrics and gynaecology,  limited to gynaecologic reproductive endocrinology
            and fertility, only.