THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:37:18 AM
Sharma, Pratibhasri Adipudi
CPSO#:
89580
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Telugu
Education: Univ of Med & Dentistry of New Jersey, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Women's College Hosp
Fertility Centre & CREATE IVF Prgrm
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 323-7727 Ext. 2339
Fax: (416) 323-7334
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:25 Nov 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 11 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |