Sharma, Niti (CPSO#: 96743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Aug 2011

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone: (705) 726-6059
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma ( CPSO# 96743 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone Number: (705) 726-1191

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Niti Sharma may practice medicine independently in family medicine, only.