skip to content

Sharma, Niti

CPSO#: 96743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Aug 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Indira Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: 705-734-6284 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Niti Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sharma ( CPSO# 96743 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
274 Hurst Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0Z3
Phone Number: (705) 726-1191


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active
             Dr. Niti Sharma may practice medicine independently in family medicine, only.