skip to content

Sharieff, Waseem

CPSO#: 87094

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BC Cancer - Abbotsford
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford BC  V2S 0C2
Phone: 18775473777 Ext. 644742
Fax: 6048514726

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WASEEM SHARIEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIEFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012