THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:48:55 AM
Sharieff, Waseem
CPSO#:
87094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
BC Cancer - Abbotsford
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford BC V2S 0C2
Phone: 18775473777 Ext. 644742
Fax: 6048514726
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WASEEM SHARIEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIEFF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |