skip to content

Shalan Al-Gazi, Mohanad Joodi

CPSO#: 85243

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Burlington Children's clinic
Unit 10-14
Suit 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905)634-1311
Fax: 905-634-7202 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M.J. Shalan Al-Gazi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalan Al-Gazi ( CPSO# 85243 )

Business Address:
Burlington Children's Clinic
Suite 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 634-1311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHANAD JOODI SHALAN AL-GAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAN AL-GAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010