THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:22:31 AM
Shalan Al-Gazi, Mohanad Joodi
CPSO#:
85243
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Burlington Children's clinic
Unit 10-14
Suit 103
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON L7N 3N2
Phone: (905)634-1311
Fax: 905-634-7202
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHANAD JOODI SHALAN AL-GAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALAN AL-GAZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2010 |