skip to content

Shaikh, Wajid Abdullah

CPSO#: 29035

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 11 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2019